Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Alberto Gori, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1889BornSan Pietro Agliana, Italy
19 Jul 191425.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
21 Nov 194960.8AppointedPatriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
27 Dec 194960.9Ordained BishopPatriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
25 Nov 197081.8DiedPatriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

MicroData Summary for Alberto Gori:
Patriarch Alberto Gori O.F.M. (born , died ) Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 113

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013