Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ottavio Abbiosi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pistoia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Mar 1584AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Pistoia, Italy
19 Mar 1584AppointedTitular Bishop of Halmiros
11 Dec 1587SucceededBishop of Pistoia, Italy
Apr 1599ResignedBishop of Pistoia, Italy
11 Mar 1614DiedBishop Emeritus of Pistoia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ottavio Abbiosi (VIAF: 90197860)
Bishop Ottavio Abbiosi (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pistoia

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Frediano, Firenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 275, and Page 105
  • d: SM, 9 Apr 2012
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1584, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast