Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Roberto Cardinal Pucci

Deceased

Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati

Major Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1464³Born
8 Aug 154177.1AppointedBishop of Pistoia, Italy
2 Jun 154278.0Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jun 154278.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
17 Oct 154480.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
31 Mar 154580.8AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
7 Dec 154682.5AppointedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
17 Jan 154782.6DiedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Roberto Pucci
Roberto Cardinal Pucci (born , died ) Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 4.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Jun 1542
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 275, and Page 241
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1541, Number 24*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast