Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Gerini

Deceased

Bishop of Pistoia e Prato


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Sep 1650AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
9 Oct 1650Ordained BishopBishop of Volterra, Italy
22 Sep 1653AppointedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
18 May 1656DiedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Gerini:
Bishop Giovanni Gerini (died ) Bishop of Pistoia e Prato

  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 281, and Page 372
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1650, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 25 Mar 2015