Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Piccioni

Deceased

Bishop of Livorno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1876Born
18 Dec 189822.5Ordained PriestPriest of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
13 Jun 192145.0AppointedBishop of Livorno, Italy
24 Jul 192145.1Ordained BishopBishop of Livorno, Italy
18 Dec 192448.5AppointedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
1933²56.5ResignedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
10 Feb 195982.6DiedBishop of Livorno, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Piccioni
Bishop Giovanni Piccioni (born , died ) Bishop of Livorno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLongone Sabino

  • a priest for 60.1 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast