Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Niccolò Cardinal Fortiguerra

Deceased

Bishop of Teano, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1419Born
25 Nov 145839.1AppointedBishop of Teano, Italy
5 Mar 146040.4Elevated to Cardinal
19 Mar 146040.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
21 Dec 147354.2DiedBishop of Teano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Niccolò Fortiguerra
Niccolò Cardinal Fortiguerra (born , died ) Bishop of Teano

EventPlace
Birth PlacePistoia, Diocese of Pistoia
Death PlaceViterbo, Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania

  • a cardinal for 13.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Mar 1460
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1458, Number 42*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 30 Oct 2018

Quantcast