Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Maria Canigiani, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Pistoia, Italy

Titular Bishop of Hippos


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Jan 1540AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pistoia, Italy
28 Jan 1540AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippos
25 Feb 1540Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippos
1541¹DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Pistoia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Maria Canigiani
Bishop Giovanni Maria Canigiani O.S.B. (died 1541) Auxiliary Bishop of Pistoia

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 211
  • ob/c2+: CB, 15 Dec 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1540, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Jul 2017