Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo António de Mello Osório

Deceased

Bishop of Guarda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1688BornPorto
26 May 172940.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
11 Jun 172940.8Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 174253.8SelectedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
26 Nov 174254.2ConfirmedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
13 Jan 174354.3Ordained BishopBishop of Guarda, Portugal
9 Jul 177182.8DiedBishop of Guarda, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Bernardo António de Mello Osório:
Bishop Bernardo António de Mello Osório (born , died ) Bishop of Guarda

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 205
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015