Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo Rogado do Carvalhal e Silva

Deceased

Bishop of Guarda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1720BornGuarda
25 Feb 174827.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Mar 174827.2Ordained PriestPriest
5 Mar 177049.2SelectedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
6 Aug 177049.6ConfirmedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
14 Oct 177049.8Ordained BishopBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
31 Dec 177050.0InstalledBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
29 Dec 177252.0SelectedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
8 Mar 177352.2ConfirmedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
19 Feb 179776.1DiedBishop of Guarda, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo Rogado do Carvalhal e Silva:
Bishop Jerónimo Rogado do Carvalhal e Silva (born , died ) Bishop of Guarda

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 205, and Page 345
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015