Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José dos Santos Garcia, S.M.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Porto Amélia, Mozambique


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1913Born
25 Jul 193825.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionários da Boa Nova
5 Apr 195743.9AppointedBishop of Porto Amélia, Mozambique
16 Jun 195744.1Ordained BishopBishop of Porto Amélia, Mozambique
15 Jan 197561.7ResignedBishop of Porto Amélia, Mozambique
11 Dec 201097.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Porto Amélia, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for José dos Santos Garcia
Bishop José dos Santos Garcia S.M.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Porto Amélia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAldeia do Souto, Portugal

  • a priest for 72.3 years
  • a bishop for 53.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast