Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Alencastre, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Braga

Titular Archbishop of Side


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1608BornAzeit„o
15 May 164537.3AppointedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
164840.0AppointedArchbishop of …vora, Portugal
165446.0AppointedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
167062.0ResignedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
24 Oct 167163.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Side
23 Apr 167365.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Braga, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Pedro Alencastre:
Archbishop Pedro Alencastre O.F.M. Cap. (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Braga

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 180
  • b: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1645, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 22 Mar 2015