Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António dos Santos

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Guarda, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1932Born
1 Jul 195624.2Ordained PriestPriest of Aveiro, Portugal
6 Dec 197543.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Aveiro, Portugal
6 Dec 197543.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabbora
4 Apr 197643.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabbora
17 Nov 197947.5AppointedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
1 Dec 200573.6ResignedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
26 Mar 201885.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Guarda, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António dos Santos
Bishop António dos Santos (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Guarda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVagos
Death PlaceHospital, Guarda, Diocese of Guarda

  • a priest for 61.7 years
  • a bishop for 41.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Dec 2005
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 26 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 27 Mar 2018