Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel Sanches Goulão

Deceased

Bishop of São Tomé of Meliapore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1677³BornAlcaino Castello Branco, Portugal
21 Dec 170023.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Sep 170124.2Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jan 171840.5SelectedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
8 Jun 171841.0ConfirmedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Sanches Goulão:
Bishop Emmanuel Sanches Goulão (born ) Bishop of São Tomé of Meliapore

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 379
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 2 Sep 2015