Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João de Oliveira Matos Ferreira

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Guarda

Titular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Lydia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1879BornValverde
28 Mar 190324.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 192243.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guarda, Portugal
11 Dec 192243.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Lydia
25 Jul 192344.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Lydia
29 Aug 196283.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Guarda, Portugal

MicroData Summary for João de Oliveira Matos Ferreira:
Bishop João de Oliveira Matos Ferreira (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Guarda

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 39.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015