Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego Secco, S.J. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Patriarch of Ethiopia

Titular Archbishop of Nicaea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1575¹BornCovilha, Portugal
1610²35.0ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
19 Dec 162247.9AppointedCoadjutor Patriarch of Ethiopia
19 Dec 162247.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
12 Mar 162348.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
4 Jul 162348.5DiedCoadjutor Patriarch of Ethiopia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Secco:
Archbishop Diego Secco S.J. (died ) Coadjutor Patriarch of Ethiopia

  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 257, and Page 71
  • ob/d: Google Books, 2012, 10, 7
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1623, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 23 Feb 2015