Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joćo dos Prazeres, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Angra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1628¹BornGuarda
8 Mar 168355.1AppointedBishop of Angra, Portugal
16 May 168355.3Ordained BishopBishop of Angra, Portugal
1 Feb 168557.0DiedBishop of Angra, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joćo dos Prazeres:
Bishop Joćo dos Prazeres O.F.M. (born 1628, died ) Bishop of Angra

  • a bishop for 1.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 87
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1683, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015