Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José de Fialho, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Guarda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1673BornVillanova de Cerveira, Portugal
23 Jan 169622.1ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
21 Feb 172551.1AppointedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
13 May 172551.4Ordained BishopBishop of Olinda, Brazil
21 Jul 173864.6SelectedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
3 Sep 173864.7ConfirmedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
22 Feb 173965.1SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Guarda, Portugal
2 Jan 174167.0ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Guarda, Portugal
18 Mar 174167.2DiedBishop of Guarda, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José de Fialho:
Archbishop José de Fialho O. Cist. (born , died ) Bishop of Guarda

  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 296
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 205, and Page 364
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015