Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José António Pinto de Mendonça Arrais

Deceased

Bishop of Guarda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1746BornSeia
26 Sep 177933.3Ordained PriestPriest
8 Aug 178236.2SelectedBishop of Pinhel, Portugal
16 Dec 178236.5ConfirmedBishop of Pinhel, Portugal
16 Feb 178336.7Ordained BishopBishop of Pinhel, Portugal
30 Mar 179750.8SelectedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
18 Dec 179751.5ConfirmedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
19 Apr 182275.8DiedBishop of Guarda, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José António Pinto de Mendonça Arrais:
Bishop José António Pinto de Mendonça Arrais (born , died ) Bishop of Guarda

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 39.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 205, and Page 338
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1783, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 1 Jan 2016