Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Alves Matoso

Deceased

Bishop of Guarda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1860BornCôja
16 Jul 188222.4Ordained PriestPriest
3 Oct 191454.6AppointedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
21 Mar 191555.1Ordained BishopBishop of Guarda, Portugal
18 Apr 191555.2InstalledBishop of Guarda, Portugal
1 Feb 195292.0DiedBishop of Guarda, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José Alves Matoso:
Bishop José Alves Matoso (born , died ) Bishop of Guarda

  • a priest for 69.5 years
  • a bishop for 36.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 14
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 164

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013