Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquim José Pacheco Sousa

Deceased

Bishop of Guarda, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1769Born
21 Sep 179324.1Ordained PriestPriest
11 Nov 183162.2SelectedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
2 Jul 183262.8ConfirmedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
23 Nov 185788.2DiedBishop of Guarda, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Joaquim José Pacheco Sousa
Bishop Joaquim José Pacheco Sousa (born , died ) Bishop of Guarda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlenquer

  • a priest for 64.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 184
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1832, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast