Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Valério da Cruz, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Portalegre, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1749Born
10 Mar 178131.3Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
11 Aug 179848.7SelectedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
13 Nov 179848.9ConfirmedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
24 Feb 179949.2Ordained BishopBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
16 Mar 179949.3InstalledBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
17 Jul 182676.6DiedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José Valério da Cruz
Bishop José Valério da Cruz C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Portalegre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCovilhã, Diocese of Guarda
Ordained BishopN.S. de Necessitudines, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 345
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1799, Number 1
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 46, Number 3,106

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast