Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Chartres

Dioecesis Carnutensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Restored: 6 October 1822
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Tours
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 5,939 (2,293 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Centre
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocese-chartres.com/
  • Mailing Address: 1 rue Saint-Eman, 28000 Chartres CEDEX, France
  • Telephone: 2.37.88.00.27
  • Fax: 2.37.91.14.91

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Chartres
3rd CenturyErectedDiocese of Chartres (erected)
29 November 1801SuppressedDiocese of Chartres (suppressed) Diocese of Versailles
Diocese of Chartres
6 October 1822RestoredDiocese of Versailles Diocese of Chartres
8 December 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Chartres (from Bourges)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Chartres
1950250,000252,69098.9%3123134372874722377ap1951
1959256,000261,03598.1%3382736570192615388ap1960
1970297,000302,20098.3%2822821,053389ap1971
1980326,000346,00094.2%212192311,41126605392ap1981
1990331,000371,00089.2%15971661,99339473389ap1991
1999358,700405,00088.6%101141153,119151539285ap2000
2000361,000407,66588.6%100201203,008202338885ap2001
2001361,000407,66588.6%96211173,085182438084ap2002
2002285,000407,66569.9%89181072,663182037782ap2003
2003285,000407,66569.9%89161052,714191836082ap2004
2004285,000407,66569.9%86171032,766231935482ap2005
2006287,000409,60070.1%84201042,759232231278ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 9 Jan 2014