Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Guillaume Lamy

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Oct 1341AppointedBishop of Apt, France
7 Oct 1342AppointedBishop of Chartres, France
2 Mar 1349AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Lamy
Patriarch Guillaume Lamy , Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 95, and Page 167
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 276

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast