Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raoul-Octove-Marie-Jean Harscouët

Deceased

Bishop of Chartres, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1874Born
9 Jul 189925.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jun 192652.0AppointedBishop of Chartres, France
22 Jul 192652.1Ordained BishopBishop of Chartres, France
18 Oct 195480.3DiedBishop of Chartres, France

MicroData Summary for Raoul-Octove-Marie-Jean Harscouët
Bishop Raoul-Octove-Marie-Jean Harscouët (born , died ) Bishop of Chartres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Brieuc

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast