Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Eugène Regnault

Deceased

Bishop of Chartres, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1800Born
20 May 182626.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 Aug 185151.4SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Chartres, France
15 Mar 185252.0ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Chartres, France
15 Mar 185252.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Eumenia
16 May 185252.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eumenia
16 Dec 185252.8SucceededBishop of Chartres, France
3 Aug 188989.4DiedBishop of Chartres, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Eugène Regnault (VIAF: 89368343)
Bishop Louis-Eugène Regnault (born , died ) Bishop of Chartres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCharleville
Ordained BishopCathedral, Reims, Archdiocese of Reims

  • a priest for 63.2 years
  • a bishop for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 182, and Page 265
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1852, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Jan 2017