Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonse-Paul-Désiré Gaudron

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Evreux

Titular Bishop of Aquae Albae in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1880BornCoudreceau
29 Jun 190424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Chartres, France
2 Aug 193050.2AppointedBishop of Evreux, France
15 Oct 193050.4Ordained BishopBishop of Evreux, France
24 Mar 196483.8RetiredBishop of Evreux, France
24 Mar 196483.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Albae in Mauretania
2 Aug 196787.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Evreux, France

MicroData Summary for Alphonse-Paul-Désiré Gaudron:
Bishop Alphonse-Paul-Désiré Gaudron (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Evreux

  • a priest for 63.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015