Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Lescot, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chartres, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1593Born
13 Dec 164148.3SelectedBishop of Chartres, France
22 Jun 164349.8ConfirmedBishop of Chartres, France
8 Nov 164350.2Ordained BishopBishop of Chartres, France
22 Aug 165663.0DiedBishop of Chartres, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques Lescot
Bishop Jacques Lescot O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Chartres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. Quentin

  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 135
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1643, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast