Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Aymeric Cardinal de Chalus

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Sep 1322AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
13 May 1332AppointedBishop of Chartres, France
20 Sep 1342AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
20 Sep 1342Elevated to Cardinal
31 Oct 1349DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti

MicroData Summary for Aymeric de Chalus
Aymeric Cardinal de Chalus (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti

EventPlace
Birth Placechâteau, Chalus, Diocese of Limoges, France
Death PlaceAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a cardinal for 7.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 415, and Page 167
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Sep 1342

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 22 May 2019

Quantcast