Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonse-Gabriel-Pierre Foucault

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Dié


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1843BornSenonches
26 May 186623.2Ordained PriestPriest of Chartres, France
3 Jan 189349.8SelectedBishop of Saint-Dié, France
19 Jan 189349.8ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Dié, France
20 Mar 189350.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Dié, France
29 Jan 191874.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Saint-Dié, France
26 May 193087.2DiedBishop of Saint-Dié, France

MicroData Summary for Alphonse-Gabriel-Pierre Foucault:
Bishop Alphonse-Gabriel-Pierre Foucault (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Dié

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 241

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013