Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Guillart

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chartres, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1533¹Born
2 Oct 155320.7AppointedBishop of Chartres, France
25 Jul 155724.5Ordained BishopBishop of Chartres, France
11 Dec 156633.9ResignedBishop of Chartres, France
Mar 1573³40.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Chartres, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles Guillart
Bishop Charles Guillart (born 1533, died Mar 1573) Bishop Emeritus of Chartres

EventPlace
Ordained Bishopéglise du Temple, Paris, Diocese of Paris
Death PlaceParis, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 153
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1557, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast