Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude-Hippolyte Clausel de Montals

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chartres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1769BornCoussergues
21 Dec 180536.7Ordained PriestPriest
8 May 182455.1SelectedBishop of Chartres, France
12 Jul 182455.3ConfirmedBishop of Chartres, France
22 Aug 182455.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chartres, France
16 Dec 185283.7RetiredBishop of Chartres, France
4 Jan 185787.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Chartres, France

MicroData Summary for Claude-Hippolyte Clausel de Montals:
Bishop Claude-Hippolyte Clausel de Montals (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chartres

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013