Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bon-Arthur-Gabriel Mollien

Deceased

Bishop of Chartres, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1834Born
19 Dec 185723.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 May 189661.6SelectedBishop of Chartres, France
25 Jun 189661.7ConfirmedBishop of Chartres, France
24 Aug 189661.8Ordained BishopBishop of Chartres, France
28 May 190469.6DiedBishop of Chartres, France

MicroData Summary for Bon-Arthur-Gabriel Mollien
Bishop Bon-Arthur-Gabriel Mollien (born , died ) Bishop of Chartres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChaulnes
Ordained BishopCathedral, Amiens, Diocese of Amiens

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 182
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast