Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guillaume Cardinal de Champagne

Deceased

Archbishop of Reims

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina

Note/Previous Titular See: (Guillaume aux blanches mains)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1135²BornChampagne, France
13 Jan 116530.0AppointedBishop of Chartres, France
1168²33.0AppointedArchbishop of Sens, France
21 Dec 116834.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sens, France
1176²41.0AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
8 Aug 117641.6InstalledArchbishop of Reims, France
Mar 117944.2Elevated to Cardinal
Mar 117944.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
7 Sep 120267.7DiedArchbishop of Reims, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume de Champagne:
Cardinal Guillaume de Champagne (died ) Archbishop of Reims

  • a bishop for 33.7 years
  • a cardinal for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, Mar 1179

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 9 Jan 2014