Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel Joseph Kuehn

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chartres, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1923Born
28 Jun 194723.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Saint-Dié, France
12 Jul 194723.7Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Dié, France
27 Jul 197854.8AppointedBishop of Chartres, France
30 Sep 197854.9Ordained BishopBishop of Chartres, France
6 Apr 199167.4ResignedBishop of Chartres, France
18 Sep 201288.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Chartres, France

MicroData Summary for Michel Joseph Kuehn (VIAF: 263817854)
Bishop Michel Joseph Kuehn (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chartres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Dié, Diocese of Saint-Dié
Ordained DeaconSaint-Joseph des Carmes of Catholic Institute, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Chartres, Diocese of Chartres
Death PlaceSaint-Dié, Diocese of Saint-Dié
Buried Place (Original)Notre-Dame, Cathedral, Chartres, Diocese of Chartres

  • a priest for 65.1 years
  • a bishop for 33.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 19 Sep 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • od/c0/loc: AJ, 17 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 19 Jul 2018

Quantcast