Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Godet des Marais

Deceased

Bishop of Chartres, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jun 1647Born
11 Feb 169042.6SelectedBishop of Chartres, France
4 Feb 169244.6ConfirmedBishop of Chartres, France
31 Aug 169245.2Ordained BishopBishop of Chartres, France
26 Sep 170962.3DiedBishop of Chartres, France

MicroData Summary for Paul Godet des Marais
Bishop Paul Godet des Marais (born Jun 1647, died ) Bishop of Chartres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTalcy en Beauce

  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 144
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast