Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giordano Cardinal Orsini (Jr.)

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Feb 1400AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
12 Jun 1405AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
12 Jun 1405Elevated to Cardinal
25 Mar 1409AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
4 Sep 1409AppointedAdministrator of Pécs, Hungary
13 Aug 1410ResignedAdministrator of Pécs, Hungary
Jun 1412³AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
23 Sep 1412Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Albano
14 Mar 1431AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
29 May 1438DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giordano Orsini (Jr.)
Giordano Cardinal Orsini (Jr.) (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

EventPlace
Birth PlacePetricoli

  • a bishop for 25.6 years
  • a cardinal for 32.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Jun 1405
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 360

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast