Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Léonor d’Estampes de Valançay, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Reims, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1589Born
17 Aug 162031.5AppointedBishop of Chartres, France
13 Dec 162031.8Ordained BishopBishop of Chartres, France
16 Dec 164152.8SelectedArchbishop of Reims, France
10 Nov 164253.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Reims, France
8 Apr 165162.1DiedArchbishop of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for Léonor d’Estampes de Valançay
Archbishop Léonor d’Estampes de Valançay O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Reims

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValencay

  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 135, and Page 295
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1620, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast