Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Albert Thomine, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Laos

Titular Bishop of Andeda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1896Born
25 May 192428.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of La Société des Missions Etrangères
20 Dec 192428.6Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
13 Jul 194448.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Laos
13 Jul 194448.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Andeda
12 Nov 194448.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Andeda
21 Mar 194548.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Laos

MicroData Summary for Henri-Albert Thomine (VIAF: 316453001)
Bishop Henri-Albert Thomine M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Laos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCherbourg, Diocese of Coutances (-Avranches), France
Ordained DeaconForeign Missions, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestForeign Missions, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopChurch, Thakhek, Vicariate Apostolic of Laos
Death PlaceNakaï, Vicariate Apostolic of Laos

  • a priest for 20.2 years
  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 55
  • loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 12 Jul 2018

Quantcast