Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Luigi (James Louis) Cheng

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Chantaburi

Titular Bishop of Barcusus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1881BornPetriu
22 May 191028.6Ordained PriestPriest
11 May 194462.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Chantaburi, Thailand
11 May 194462.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Barcusus
11 Feb 194563.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Barcusus
14 Apr 195270.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Chantaburi, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Luigi (James Louis) Cheng:
Bishop Giacomo Luigi (James Louis) Cheng (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Chantaburi

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013