Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Arsène-Jean-Marie-Eugène Lemasle, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Huê

Titular Bishop of Teuchira


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1874BornServon, France
26 Jun 189823.5Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
4 Feb 193762.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Huê, Viet Nam
4 Feb 193762.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Teuchira
27 May 193762.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Teuchira
26 Sep 194671.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Huê, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for François-Arsène-Jean-Marie-Eugène Lemasle:
Bishop François-Arsène-Jean-Marie-Eugène Lemasle M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Huê

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013