Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ange-Marie-Joseph Gouin, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Laos

Titular Bishop of Orcistus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1877BornMaxent, France
22 Jun 190224.5Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
27 Apr 192244.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Laos
27 Apr 192244.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Orcistus
1 Oct 192244.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Orcistus
1 Jul 194365.6ResignedVicar Apostolic of Laos
21 Mar 194567.3DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Laos

MicroData Summary for Ange-Marie-Joseph Gouin:
Bishop Ange-Marie-Joseph Gouin M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Laos

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013