Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Bernardino Vendemini

Deceased

Bishop of Sarsina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1678Born
28 Oct 171234.5Ordained PriestPriest
11 May 173355.0AppointedBishop of Sarsina, Italy
25 May 173355.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sarsina, Italy
21 Sep 174971.4DiedBishop of Sarsina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Bernardino Vendemini
Bishop Giovanni Bernardino Vendemini (born , died ) Bishop of Sarsina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCesena

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 368
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1733, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast