Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Casimiro Rossi

Deceased

Archbishop of Salerno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1685BornNapoli
23 Dec 171934.7Ordained PriestPriest
4 Sep 173247.4SelectedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
19 Jan 173347.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
25 Jan 173347.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
5 May 173853.1AppointedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
27 Dec 175873.7DiedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Casimiro Rossi:
Archbishop Casimiro Rossi (born , died ) Archbishop of Salerno

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 363, and Page 393
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1733, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015