Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Thomas Philip Wallrad Cardinal d’Hénin-Létard d’Alsace-Boussut de Chimay

Deceased

Archbishop of Mechelen

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1679BornBrussels
20 Nov 170122.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
15 Oct 170222.9Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 171536.0AppointedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
19 Jan 171636.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
29 Nov 171940.0Elevated to Cardinal
16 Jun 172141.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Cesareo in Palatio
2 Dec 173354.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
17 Jul 175272.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
5 Jan 175979.1DiedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Thomas Philip Wallrad d’Hénin-Létard d’Alsace-Boussut de Chimay:
Thomas Philip Wallrad Cardinal d’Hénin-Létard d’Alsace-Boussut de Chimay (born , died ) Archbishop of Mechelen

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 42.9 years
  • a cardinal for 39.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Nov 1719
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,526

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015