Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Francisco Ingenuo

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1679BornNapoli
31 May 173555.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
4 Jun 173555.9Ordained PriestPriest
18 Sep 174162.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)
12 Nov 174162.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)
23 Oct 174465.2DiedTitular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francisco Ingenuo:
Bishop Giovanni Francisco Ingenuo (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)

  • a priest for 9.3 years
  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 195
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015