Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonino Cardinal Sersale

Deceased

Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1702Born
23 Sep 172422.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
26 May 172522.9Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 174341.2AppointedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
29 Sep 174341.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
16 Nov 175048.3AppointedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
11 Feb 175451.6AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
22 Apr 175451.8Elevated to Cardinal
20 May 175451.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
24 Jun 177572.9DiedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonino Sersale (VIAF: 89743149)
Antonino Cardinal Sersale (born , died ) Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSorrento
Ordained BishopSan Giovanni delle Monache, Church, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Death PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.7 years
  • a cardinal for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Apr 1754
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 37
  • c34: AT, 5 Jun 2018
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,721

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 3 Jul 2018

Quantcast