Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Renato Cardinal Imperiali

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1651Born
13 Feb 169038.7Elevated to Cardinal
10 Apr 169038.9InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
9 Dec 172675.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giorgio in Velabro
20 Jan 172775.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
17 Nov 173281.5ResignedCardinal-Priest of San Giorgio in Velabro
15 Jan 173785.7DiedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Renato Imperiali
Giuseppe Renato Cardinal Imperiali (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOria, Italy

  • a cardinal for 46.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Feb 1690

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast