Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Niccolò Borgia

Deceased

Bishop of Aversa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1700BornNapoli
22 May 172323.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jul 175151.2AppointedBishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy
11 Jul 175151.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy
27 Mar 176564.9AppointedBishop of Aversa, Italy
6 Apr 177978.9DiedBishop of Aversa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Niccolò Borgia:
Bishop Niccolò Borgia (born , died ) Bishop of Aversa

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 111, and Page 158

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013