Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Hay

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Lowland District, Scotland

Titular Bishop of Daulia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1729BornEdinburgh
21 Dec 174920.3Converted
11 Mar 175828.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lowland District, Scotland, Great Britain
2 Apr 175828.6Ordained PriestPriest of Lowland District, Scotland, Great Britain
5 Oct 176839.1AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Lowland District, Scotland, Great Britain
5 Oct 176839.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Daulia
21 May 176939.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Daulia
3 Dec 177849.2SucceededVicar Apostolic of Lowland District, Scotland, Great Britain
24 Aug 180576.0RetiredVicar Apostolic of Lowland District, Scotland, Great Britain
15 Oct 181182.1DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Lowland District, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for George Hay
Bishop George Hay (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Lowland District

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 42.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1769, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 193, and Page 455
  • od/c01: CB, 17 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 18 Feb 2016