Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Fernando Cardinal Spinelli

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1728BornNaples, Italy
14 Feb 178556.3Elevated to Cardinal
11 Apr 178556.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
3 Aug 178960.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
20 Mar 179061.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Nov 179062.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
18 Dec 179567.1DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin

MicroData Summary for Fernando Spinelli:
Cardinal Fernando Spinelli (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin

  • a cardinal for 10.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Feb 1785

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013